IL SB2488 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that any member of the General Assembly shall, upon being charged with a crime or the return of an indictment for a crime, be immediately removed from any leadership position held by that person. Provides that if the charges are dropped or dismissed, or the member is acquitted of the crime, his or her leadership position shall not be automatically restored, but he or she shall once again be eligible to hold a leadership position. Provides that any person serving as a commissioner of the Legislative Ethics Commission shall, upon being charged with a crime or the return of an indictment for a crime, be immediately removed from his or her position as a commissioner of the Commission. Provides that if the charges are dropped or dismissed, or the former commissioner is acquitted of the crime, his or her position as a commissioner shall not be automatically restored, but he or she shall once again be eligible to hold a position as a commissioner. Makes conforming changes.
Title
ETHICS-GA LEADERSHIP & LEC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 25-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-63 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2488&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2488.htm |