IL SB2495 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health Early Action on Campus Act. Provides that if a public higher education institution issues student identification cards to its students, the institution must provide contact information for certain suicide prevention and mental health resources on each student identification card. Provides that if an institution does not issue student identification cards to its students, the institution must publish the contact information on its website. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
HIGHER ED-MENTAL HEALTH-STU ID
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 58 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2495&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2495.htm |