IL SB2496 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that no fee shall be required if the records sought to be expunged or sealed were arrests resulting in release without charging or arrests or charges not initiated by arrest resulting in acquittal, dismissal, or conviction when the conviction was reversed or vacated, except for the expungement or sealing of certain records of minor traffic violations. Eliminates the county fee waiver pilot program that was only applicable in counties of 3,000,000 or more inhabitants that was set to expire on January 1, 2021.
Title
CRIM ID-EXPUNGEMENT FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-002-000 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2496&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2496.htm |