IL SB2540 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that each Department of Corrections facility shall have at least one telephone for every 10 inmates in the facility.
Title
CD CORR-TELEPHONE AVAILABILITY
Sponsors
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] |
Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. John Curran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-4-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2540&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2540.htm |