IL SB2560 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Complete Streets Act. Requires the Department of Transportation to use federal or State funds allocated for transportation projects to improve safety, access, and mobility for users of the various modes of transportation. Creates the Complete Streets Advisory Board. Provides that the Governor shall appoint members representing various agencies, organizations, or interest groups to the Advisory Board. Provides that the Advisory Board, in coordination with a representative or representatives of the Department, shall prepare a report on the status of the implementation of the Complete Streets Initiative. Provides that the Advisory Board shall submit its initial report and recommendations to the Governor, the Department, and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2022, and annually on January 1 of each subsequent year. Defines the terms "Advisory Board", "Department", "multimodal", "multimodal planning or multimodal transportation planning", and "user or users". Effective immediately.
Title
COMPLETE STREETS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2560&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2560.htm |