IL SB2752 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that Illinois Identification Cards issued to persons upon conditional release or absolute discharge from the custody of the Department of Human Services be issued prior to release or discharge (instead of no sooner than 14 days prior to release or discharge). Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that applicants for school bus driver permits and commercial driver's licenses must not have been convicted of (i) aggravated domestic battery, or (ii) specified offenses under the Liquor Control Act of 1934 within the last 20 years before the date of the application (rather than at any point in the applicant 's past). Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a subsection concerning required proof of financial responsibility does not apply to a person who, at the time of the offense, was operating a motor vehicle registered in a state other than Illinois. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SOS: ID CARDS-CDL-SCHOOL BUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-106.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-508 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-6-3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2752&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2752.htm |