IL SB2796 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Guardians for Adults with Disabilities Article of the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that one of the persons who performed the evaluations upon which the report relating to the adjudication of disability is based shall be a licensed physician or a licensed clinical psychologist (rather than "shall be a licensed physician"). Provides that the report in support of a verified petition to allow a ward to execute a will or codicil may be from a licensed clinical psychologist (rather than only a current physician).
Title
GUARDIANSHIP-PSYCHOLOGISTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 11a-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2796&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2796.htm |