IL SB2902 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Repeals a Section providing authority to use automated traffic law enforcement systems at intersections in which cameras are used to photograph or video record a motor vehicle's failure to stop and yield as required by traffic control signals. Imposes limits on the power of local governments to use automated traffic law enforcement systems to provide recorded images of a motor vehicle for the purpose of recording its speed. Denies home rule powers. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement from the State. Makes conforming and other technical changes.
Title
VEH CD-REPEAL REDLIGHT CAMERAS
Sponsors
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] |
Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Traffic Safety Systems |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 1-105.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-306.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2902&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2902.htm |