IL SB2943 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that a pesticide applicator shall notify a beekeeper if the pesticide is applied within 3 miles of the beekeeper's colony registered with the Department of Agriculture under the Bees and Apiaries Act. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
EPA-PESTICIDE APPLICATORS
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Fowler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2943&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2943.htm |