IL SB2998 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Livestock Management Facilities Act. Provides that the owner or operator of a livestock management facility of less than 1,000 animal units shall be (rather than shall not be) required to prepare and maintain a waste management plan. Requires the owner or operator of an existing livestock management facility that has or will exceed more than 5,000 animal units to file its waste management plan with the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency and the Department of Agriculture (rather than only the Department of Agriculture). Provides that a waste management plan shall be submitted electronically to both the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency and the Department of Agriculture. Provides that any person who is issued a warning from the Department for failure to submit a waste management plan shall have 15 working days (rather than 30 working days) to prepare a waste management plan. Provides that following the second violation, the Department shall (rather than may) issue an operational cease and desist order until compliance is attained.
Title
ANIMALS-WASTE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (AG) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 77 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2998&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2998.htm |