IL SB3019 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Universities Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that as soon as practicable after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the optional defined contribution plan shall provide for an eligible automatic contribution arrangement that permits a withdrawal of default elective contributions in accordance with a specified provision of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended, and United States Department of Treasury regulations promulgated thereunder. Changes references from "defined contribution benefit" to "defined contribution plan". Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-SURS-OPTIONAL DC PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 012-000-000 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 15-202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |