IL SB3028 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Infrastructure Development Act. Provides that the State Treasurer shall segregate a portion of the Treasurer's State investment portfolio in the Infrastructure Development Account, an account that shall be maintained separately and apart from other moneys invested by the State Treasurer. Allows the State Treasurer to make investments concerning the Infrastructure Development Account. Provides for Infrastructure Development Account-Recipient Funds created by Illinois infrastructure development firms in which the State Treasurer places money. Provides further requirements concerning Infrastructure Development Account-Recipient Funds. Provides for the adoption rules. Provides that the Infrastructure Development Fund is created as a special fund in the State treasury, which may receive a portion of earnings from the Infrastructure Development Account and may be used by the State Treasurer to pay expenses related to the Act. Defines terms. Amends the State Finance Act to provide for the Infrastructure Development Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
TREASURER-INFRASTRUCTURE DEV
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-03-05 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |