IL SB3066 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Clerks of Courts Act. Provides that the State Treasurer, for purposes related to the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act, is not required to pay various fees to the circuit court clerk. Amends the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Provides that the State Treasurer has the authority to access and reproduce, at no cost, vital records and court records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TREASURER-CLERK & RECORD FEES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2020-06-23HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2020-06-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2020-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-005-000
2020-05-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2020-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2020-05-21HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
2020-05-21HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2020-05-21HouseLegislation Considered in Special Session No. 1
2020-03-05HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2020-03-05HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-03-05HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2020-03-04HouseArrived in House
2020-03-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020
2020-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020
2020-02-19SenateDo Pass Local Government; 011-000-000
2020-02-11SenateAssigned to Local Government
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2020-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70510527.1bAmended CodeCitation Text
765102615-504Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback