IL SB3087 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that incidental sales of finished compost do need not to be applied to agronomic rates in determining whether a person needs a permit to conduct a landscape waste composting operation at specified sites. Removes a provision requiring that no fee is charged for the acceptance of materials to be composted in order for a site having 10 or more occupied non-farm residences within 1/2 mile of its boundaries to be excepted from permit requirements.
Title
EPA-COMPOSTING FACILITY
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As June 23, 2020 |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 17, 2020 |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3087&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3087.htm |