IL SB3109 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Lead in Schools Reporting Act. Provides that on an annual basis the Department of Public Health, in coordination with local departments of public health, shall conduct specified lead testing at public school facilities. Provides that the Department shall notify the Board and the public school facility if a detected lead level meets a level that the Department deems unsafe. Provides that if a public school facility has received notification from the Department that the lead level in the public school facility has been deemed unsafe, then the public school facility's school board or school personnel must provide written notification to its students' parents or guardians of the Department's findings, including the lead level, no later than 10 calendar days after being notified by the Department.
Title
SCHOOL LEAD TESTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3109&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3109.htm |