IL SB3128 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning the offense of financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability. Expands the scope of "person who stands in a position of trust and confidence" to include a friend or acquaintance of the elderly person or person with a disability who is in a position of trust.
Title
CRIM CD-FINANCIAL EXPLOITATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 16-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 17-56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3128&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3128.htm |