IL SB3147 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Director of Public Health shall establish a standing order complete with the issuance of a prescription for a smoking cessation product. Prescribes minimum requirements for the standing order. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or a managed care plan that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall provide coverage for patient care services provided by a pharmacist for smoking cessation assessments and consultations. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Provides that the "practice of pharmacy" includes the assessment and consultation of patients and dispensing of tobacco and nicotine cessation drugs and products. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, subject to approval by the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, the medical assistance program shall cover patient care services provided by a pharmacist for smoking cessation assessments and consultations. Defines terms. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
PHARMACIST-SMOKING CESSATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-03-04 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (IN) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2310 | 2310-701 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 85 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.12c | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3147&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3147.htm |