IL SB3161 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Navigator Certification Act. Provides that certified application counselors are subject to the same certification requirements as navigators. Provides that navigators or certified application counselors may not engage in any unfair method of competition or any fraudulent, deceptive, or dishonest act or practice related to the health insurance marketplace or to that individual's or entity's absence of a conflict of interest in connection with the enrollment of any individuals or employees in a particular private health benefit plan. Provides that a navigator or certified application counselor who fails to timely file for certificate renewal shall be charged a late fee in an amount prescribed by the Director of Insurance. Replaces provisions concerning criteria and requirements for entities or individuals applying for a navigator certificate with language allowing the Director of Insurance to establish certification terms and requirements for completed applications and exemptions from certification by rule for navigator or certified application counselor certificates. Revises the meaning of the terms "certified application counselor" and "navigator". Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
INS-NAVIGATOR CERTIFICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 016-000-000 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 121 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 121 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 121 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
215 | 121 | 25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
215 | 121 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 121 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 121 | 40 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
215 | 121 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 121 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3161&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3161.htm |