IL SB3170 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that a unit of local government or school district with a population of 25,000 or more shall maintain an Internet website, and any unit of local government or school district that maintains an Internet website shall post to its website for the current calendar or fiscal year specified information. Limits home rule. Provides that all local records required to be posted shall remain posted on the entity's website, or subsequent websites, for 10 years. Exempts school districts controlled by the Department of Juvenile Justice. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides an exemption from inspection and copying of any record or information that a unit of local government or school district maintains an electronic copy of on its website to comply with the Open Meetings Act. Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that within 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Illinois Transparency and Accountability Portal shall have the capability to compile and update its database with information received from all school districts and units of local government. Authorizes the Illinois Transparency and Accountability Portal to provide direct access to information compiled under specified provisions of the Open Meetings Act. Provides an exempt mandate provision. Provides a severability clause. Effective immediately.
Title
OPEN MEETINGS-GOV TRANSPARENCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 405 | 405-335 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 805 | 8.44 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 120 | 2.03.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3170&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3170.htm |