IL SB3205 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that those intending to become write-in candidates for statewide, congressional, state legislative, or judicial offices or offices in which the electors are not entirely within a county shall file a notarized declaration of intent with the State Board of Elections. Provides what shall be included in a declaration of intent. Provides that all write-in votes shall be counted for persons who filed the notarized declaration of intent with the appropriate election authority between 75 days and 65 days before the general primary and between 120 days and 75 days before the election or consolidated primary (rather than 61 days before the primary or election). Provides that persons intending to become write-in candidates for the offices of President and Vice President or Governor and Lieutenant Governor shall file one joint declaration of intent to be a write-in candidate with the State Board of Elections and that votes case for either candidate shall constitute a valid write-in vote for the slate of candidates. Provides that the State Board of Elections shall provide a listing of valid write-in candidates to the appropriate election authority before the deadline for ballot certification. Makes conforming changes throughout the Code and the Illinois Municipal Code.
Title
ELECT CD-WRITE-IN CANDIDATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 17-16.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 18-9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 7-59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-20-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-25-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3205&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3205.htm |