IL SB3216 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Provides that the Veterans' Service-Related Ailments Task Force shall meet at least once every 2 months beginning January 1, 2021 (rather than beginning July 1, 2019). Requires the Task Force to submit the report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2022 (rather than December 31, 2020). Dissolves the Task Force and repeals provisions on December 31, 2023 (rather than December 31, 2021). Effective immediately.
Title
VETERANS SERVICE-TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2805 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3216&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3216.htm |