IL SB3269 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that within 30 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Department of Human Services and the Department of Healthcare and Family Services (Departments) shall increase by 20% rates and reimbursements in effect on June 30, 2020 for community-based providers of services for persons with developmental disabilities and for ID/DD facilities and MC/DD facilities. Requires community-based providers, ID/DD facilities, and MC/DD facilities to use at least 75% of the amount of the rate increase to increase the wages and benefits paid to their staff. Requires the Departments to ensure wage rate components are at least 145% of the statewide, regional, or local minimum wage rate, whichever is higher, as determined by the Departments. Requires community-based providers of services for persons with developmental disabilities, ID/DD facilities, and MC/DD facilities to certify compliance with the provisions of the amendatory Act in a form and manner prescribed by the Departments. Requires the Departments to adopt emergency rules to implement the provisions of the amendatory Act. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Grants the Departments emergency rulemaking authority. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-DHFS-RATE INCREASES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 55.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.4i | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3269&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3269.htm |