IL SB3290 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Creates a sales agent and broker license to solicit or receive business from current or potential establishments licensed under the Act. Provides that a person may not solicit the signing of a use agreement on behalf of a terminal operator or enter into a use agreement as agent of a terminal operator unless that person either has a valid sales agent and broker license or owns, manages, or significantly influences or controls the terminal operator. Provides the fee for the issuance and renewal for the sales agent and broker license. Effective immediately.
Title
VIDEO GAMING-SALES AGENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Gaming |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3290&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3290.htm |