IL SB3337 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to establish reimbursement rates that build toward livable wages for front-line personnel in residential and day programs and service coordination agencies serving persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities. Provides that the Department shall increase rates and reimbursements so that by July 1, 2020 direct support persons wages shall be increased by $2 per hour, and so that other front-line personnel earn a commensurate wage. Requires the Department to increase rates and reimbursements in effect on January 1, 2020 for community-based providers for persons with developmental disabilities in order to fund, at a minimum, a $2 per hour wage increase. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that for facilities ID/DD facilities and MC/DD facilities, the rates taking effect within 30 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall include an increase sufficient to provide a $2 per hour wage increase for non-executive front-line personnel, including, but not limited to, other specified staff and support personnel. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to increase the rates for ID/DD facilities and MC/DD facilities taking effect for services delivered on or after January 1, 2020 to provide a minimum $2 per hour wage increase over the wages in effect on December 30, 2019. Requires the Department to increase rates and reimbursements in effect on January 1, 2020 for community-based providers for persons with developmental disabilities in order to fund a minimum $2 per hour wage increase. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that the Departments of Human Services and Healthcare and Family Services may adopt emergency rules. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-DHS-DIRECT SUPPORT WAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 55.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1705 | 74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.4i | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3337&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3337.htm |