IL SB3384 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that the Code shall not apply to procurements made by or on behalf of public institutions of higher education for procurement expenditures for the search and placement of medical practitioners necessary for clinical and academic staffing at the teaching hospitals located at the Southern Illinois University School of Medicine, the University of Illinois at Chicago, and the University of Illinois Champaign-Urbana. Provides that a lease for real property owned by Southern Illinois University to be used by the Southern Illinois University School of Medicine for an ambulatory surgical center may exceed 10 years in length under specified circumstances, but may not exceed 30 years in length.
Title
PROCURE-APPLICABILITY & LEASES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Procurement |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Procurement |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 1-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 40-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |