IL SB3454 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the certified training programs in crisis intervention established by the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board shall include addressing transportation of people with mental illnesses. Provides that the training includes understanding procedures for an involuntary transportation of people with mental illnesses to an evaluation setting.
Title
POLICE TRAIN-TRANSPORT MENTAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 705 | 10.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3454&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3454.htm |