IL SB3457 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Local Journalism Task Force Act. The Task Force shall consist of one member of the House of Representatives appointed by the Speaker of the House of Representatives, one member of the Senate appointed by the President of the Senate; one member appointed by the Governor, and one representative of each of the following entities: the Medill School of Journalism, Media, Integrated Marketing Communications at Northwestern University; the Journalism Department of the College of Media at the University of Illinois at Urbana-Champaign; the School of Journalism at Southern Illinois University Carbondale; the Illinois Press Association; the Illinois Broadcasters Association; the Illinois Legislative Correspondents Association; and the Illinois Municipal League. Directs the Task Force to study communities underserved by local journalism and review all aspects of journalism. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to provide administrative support. Provides that the Task Force shall report its findings and recommendations of legislation to the Governor and General Assembly.
Title
LOCAL JOURNALISM TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |