IL SB3488 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Real Estate Transactions Article of the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a civil rights violation to refuse to sell, rent, or otherwise make unavailable or deny, or to alter the terms, conditions, or privileges of sale or rental, of a housing accommodation or dwelling to any buyer or renter due to the fact of an arrest or criminal history record information ordered expunged, sealed, or impounded under the Criminal Identification Act. Effective immediately.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS-HOUSING-ARREST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Held in Criminal Law |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3488&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3488.htm |