IL SB3488 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0976
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0976
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Architecture Practice Act of 1989. Removes a provision stating that a member's service on the Illinois Architecture Licensing Board that occurred prior to the effective date of the Act shall not be considered in determining the length of his or her consecutive years of service. Further provides that an applicant for licensure under the Act shall be required to complete certain experience requirements in addition to the examination requirements under the Act, and that he or she has one year from the date of notification of successful completion of all examination and experience requirements to apply to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation for a license. Includes a professional land surveyor in the definition of "Illinois licensed design professional". Effective immediately.
Title
ARCHITECTURE PRACTICE ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0976 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Effective Date August 15, 2014 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2014-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2014-04-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 305 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 305 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 305 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |