IL SB3511 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Renter's Financial Responsibility and Protection Act. Provides that a rental company may void a damage waiver for damage or loss to the rental vehicle if the rental vehicle is stolen and the renter fails to: (i) return the rental vehicle's ignition key and the key tag identifying the rental vehicle to the rental vehicle company; (ii) file a police report within the 24-hour period after discovery of the rental vehicle theft; and (iii) fully cooperate with the rental company, law enforcement agency, or any other authority in all matters connected to the investigation of the stolen rental vehicle.
Title
RENTAL VEH-DAMAGE WAIVER
Sponsors
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] |
Sen. Dave Syverson [R] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 27 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3511&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3511.htm |