IL SB3514 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Installment Loan Act. Provides that an income share agreement provider shall clearly and conspicuously disclose specified information in an income-based financing transaction no later than 3 business days before the consummation of the transaction. Requires an income share agreement provider to disclose a borrower's effective annual percentage rate under specified scenarios. Requires an income share agreement provider to provide a borrower with a monthly statement within 15 days before a payment due date, and to provide a borrower with an annual statement. Provides that the contractual payment percentage of an agreement may not exceed 5% of a borrower's qualified income, and no income share agreement term may exceed 60 months. Provides that an income share agreement provider shall not contract for a payment cap that exceeds 1.10 times the amount of the advance or extend an advance that exceeds $5,000. Provides that no payment may be collected under the terms of an income share agreement when a borrower is enrolled in a covered educational program, or during the 6-month grace period after a borrower leaves such a program. Provides that an income share agreement provider shall not engage in unfair or deceptive practices toward a borrower or misrepresent or omit any material information in connection with an income-based financing transaction. Provides that a borrower must exhaust all sources of federal student loans and state grants for which the borrower is directly eligible before entering into an educational income share agreement. Requires an income share agreement provider to provide readily accessible methods for consumers to submit a request for assistance to the provider, and to implement a process by which a borrower can escalate any request for assistance. Makes other changes. Defines terms.
Title
INCOME SHARE AGREEMENT-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 670 | 17.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 670 | 17.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3514&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3514.htm |