IL SB3518 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Modifies the exemptions from inspection and copying concerning cybersecurity vulnerabilities. Amends the Department of Innovation and Technology Act. Authorizes the Department of Innovation and Technology to accept grants and donations. Creates the Technology, Education, and Cybersecurity Fund as a special fund in the State treasury to be used by the Department of Innovation and Technology to promote and effectuate information technology activities. Requires a local government official or employee to be chosen to act as the primary point of contact for local cybersecurity issues. Amends the Illinois Information Security Improvement Act. Requires the Secretary of Innovation and Technology to establish a cybersecurity liaison program to advise and assist units of local government and school districts concerning specified cybersecurity issues. Provides for cybersecurity training for employees of counties, municipalities, and school districts. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that State agencies are prohibited from purchasing any products that, due to cybersecurity risks, are prohibited for purchase by federal agencies pursuant to a United States Department of Homeland Security Binding Operational Directive. Amends the State Finance Act to provide for the Technology, Education, and Cybersecurity Fund.
Title
CYBERSECURITY-INFORMATION TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1370 | 1-65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1375 | 5-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1375 | 5-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.930 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 55-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |