IL SB3749 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision requiring a retirement system, pension fund, or investment board to adopt a policy setting forth goals for the utilization of emerging investment managers, provides that the goals established shall be based on the total dollar amount of fees paid under (instead of the total dollar amount of) investment contracts let to minority-owned businesses, women-owned businesses, and businesses owned by a person with a disability. Makes related changes. Requires the goals to be established on or before January 1, 2021. Provides that it shall be the aspirational goal for a retirement system, pension fund, or investment board subject to the Code to use emerging investment managers for not less than 20% of the fees paid in each asset class (instead of 20% of the total funds under management). Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-INVESTMENT GOALS
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-109.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3749&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3749.htm |