IL SB3782 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, 15% of the total annual funds appropriated for grants made under the monetary award program shall be set aside by the Illinois Student Assistance Commission for the purpose of making grants that shall be awarded to students attending a public community college in this State. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-MAP GRANTS
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3782&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3782.htm |