IL SB3787 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Build Illinois Homes Tax Credit Act. Provides that the Illinois Housing Development Authority and the City of Chicago Department of Housing may award credits for certain qualified low-income housing projects. Provides that the credits may be taken against any or all of the following: (i) the taxes imposed by the Illinois Income Tax Act; or (ii) any retaliatory or privilege tax imposed by the Illinois Insurance Code. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act and the Illinois Insurance Code to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-BUILD ILLINOIS HOMES
Sponsors
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Ann Gillespie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 409 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 444 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 232 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3787&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3787.htm |