IL SB3793 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate and Chicago Teacher Articles of the Illinois Pension Code to require school districts to pay the employer normal cost of benefits beginning in fiscal year 2021. Amends the State Pension Funds Continuing Appropriation Act to appropriate from the Common School Fund to the State Board of Education, on a continuing annual basis beginning with fiscal year 2021, the amount certified as the employer normal cost, to be distributed by the State Board of Education under the evidence-based funding formula provisions of the School Code. Amends the evidence-based funding formula provisions of the School Code to make changes concerning the employee benefit investments calculation and the Base Funding Minimum calculation. Effective immediately.
Title
ACCELERATION OF SCHOOL FUNDING
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] |
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 18-8.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 15 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 15 | 1.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-127 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-129 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3793&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3793.htm |