IL SB3811 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Secure Choice Savings Program Act. Provides that the Act applies to employers with at least one employee, rather than fewer than 25 employees. Provides for automatic increases in contributions. Makes changes regarding penalties for employers who fail, without reasonable cause, to enroll an employee in the Program. Provides that, for purposes of the penalties, the Department of Revenue shall determine total employee count for employers using the annual average from employer-reported quarterly data. Provides that the Department may provide notice regarding penalties in an electronic format to be determined by the Department. Provides that penalty provisions shall become operative by January 1, 2021, rather than 9 months after the Illinois Secure Choice Savings Board notifies the Director of Revenue that the Program has been implemented.
Title
SECURE CHOICE SAVINGS PROGRAM
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 80 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 80 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 80 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 80 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3811&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3811.htm |