IL SB3822 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Prior Authorization Reform Act. Provides requirements concerning disclosure and review of prior authorization requirements, denial of claims or coverage by a utilization review program, and the implementation of prior authorization requirements or restrictions. Provides requirements concerning a utilization review program's obligations with respect to prior authorizations in nonurgent circumstances, urgent health care services, and emergency health care services. Provides that a utilization review program shall not require prior authorization under specified circumstances. Provides requirements concerning the length of prior authorizations. Provides that health care services are automatically deemed authorized if a utilization review program fails to comply with the requirements of the Act. Provides that the Director of Insurance may impose an administrative fine not to exceed $250,000 for violations of the Act. Defines terms. Amends the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act to provide that an insurer that provides prescription drug benefits must comply with the requirements of the Prior Authorization Reform Act. Provides that if prior authorization for covered post-stabilization services is required by a health care plan, the plan shall comply with the requirements of the Prior Authorization Reform Act. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code to provide that all managed care organizations shall comply with the requirements of the Prior Authorization Reform Act. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
PRIOR AUTHORIZATION REFORM ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 134 | 45.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 134 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.12d | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3822&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3822.htm |