IL SB3851 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Certified Professional Midwives Practice Act. Provides for the licensure of midwives by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation and for certain limitations on the activities of licensed midwives. Creates the Illinois Midwifery Board. Sets forth provisions concerning application, qualifications, grounds for disciplinary action, and administrative procedures. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to set a repeal date for the new Act of January 1, 2031. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code, the Medical Practice Act of 1987, the Nurse Practice Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code to make related changes.
Title
MIDWIVES PRACTICE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Neil Anderson |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 60 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 50-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3851&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3851.htm |