IL SB3893 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Provides that certain socially disadvantaged persons are considered minority persons under the Act. Provides that a "socially disadvantaged person" means a person individually certified by the Business Enterprise Council for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities as having been subjected to racial or ethnic prejudice or cultural bias within American society because of his or her identity as a member of a group and without regard to his or her individual qualities.
Title
DBE-MINORITY PERSON
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As June 23, 2020 |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 17, 2020 |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 575 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |