IL SB3992 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for employers who hire residents of the State to work in the fields of technology, health care, or manufacturing if those residents were unemployed as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic. Sets forth the amount of the credit. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EMPLOYMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-05-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3992&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3992.htm |