IL SJR0001 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the US 20 bridge over Illinois Route 31 as the Sergeant Marcos Leonardo Gudino Memorial Bridge.
Title
SGT MARCOS GUDINO BRIDGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted 113-000-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 6, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled with Secretary |