IL SJR0002 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares the last week of October in 2019 as Dyslexia Awareness Week in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DYSLEXIA AWARENESS WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-06-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-06-01SenateAdopted Both Houses
2019-06-01HouseResolution Adopted
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2019-05-15HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-14HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-16HouseArrived in House
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-02-21SenateResolution Adopted
2019-02-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-01-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 5, 2019
2019-01-31SenateBe Adopted State Government; 006-000-000
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback