IL SJR0016 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares February 7, 2019 as Black HIV/AIDS Awareness Day in Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BLACK HIV/AIDS AWARENESS DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-04-16HouseArrived in House
2019-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-21SenateResolution Adopted
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateBe Adopted Public Health; 012-000-000
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback