IL SJR0024 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Department of Transportation to take certain steps to advance implementation of the State's Complete Streets Law and 2012 bicycle plan.
Title
IDOT-COMPLETE STREETS-BICYCLES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 049-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 6, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |