IL SJR0027 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency to consider the serious concerns of the residents of Lake County over the recent ethylene oxide emissions due to the environmental and public health threats it poses to the people of Illinois. Urges the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency to conduct ambient air monitoring and testing in and around the two known facilities emitting or discharging ethylene oxide in Lake County. Urges the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency to take whatever actions possible to assist in the ambient air monitoring and protection of the public in regards to the environmental and health risks posed by ethylene oxide emissions in Lake County.
Title
LAKE COUNTY-ETHYLENE OXIDE-EPA
Sponsors
Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-16 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 030-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Energy & Environment Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 19, 2019 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Be Adopted Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=27&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SJR/10100SJ0027.htm |