IL SJR0028 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the State Treasurer to issue official commemorative medallions honoring the 100th anniversary of the ratification of the 19th Amendment to the United States Constitution. The State Treasurer shall contract for the production, marketing, distribution, and sale of the medallions.
Title
19TH AMEND. COMM. MEDALLIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - Motion in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted 114-000-000 |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 047-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |