IL SJR0029 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct a performance audit of the Department of State Police's administration of the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act.
Title
AUDIT-STATE POLICE-FOID
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=29&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SJR/10100SJ0029.htm |