IL SJR0035 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Addiction Prevention Task Force to study chronic and binge drinking in Illinois and suggest recommendations to the General Assembly on strengthening and expanding the statewide addiction prevention system.
Title
ADDICTION PREVENTION TSK FORCE
Sponsors
Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] |
Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - Motion in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted 114-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |