IL SJR0036 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the General Assembly to promptly review and evaluate any waiver requests transmitted to the General Assembly and determine whether to disapprove, in whole or in part, any transmitted waiver requests.
Title
WAIVER OF SCHOOL CODE MANDATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Rezin |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended Education; 012-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |